THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:08:28 AM
Donahue, Paula Catherine
CPSO#:
33166
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Chemotherapy Unit
St Thomas ON N5P 3W2
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Ext. 2217
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,St Thomas Mental Health Site |
St Thomas |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAULA CATHERINE DONAHUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAHUE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Oct 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1984 |