THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:12:04 AM
Litwin, Shlomo
CPSO#:
33134
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
202-149 Second Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 2H6
Phone: 613 612 6072
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records location: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should
contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, email to:
[email protected], or send written request by mail to: 1 High
Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 05 Feb 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1980 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHLOMO LITWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITWIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 1982 |