THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:28:02 AM
Murphy, David Ashton
CPSO#:
33103
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Mar 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Mar 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
913-101 Robson Rd
Leamington ON N8H 4R6
Phone: 5193258865
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David A. Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ASHTON MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 1982 |