THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:13:05 PM
Coghlan, Raymond Anthony
CPSO#:
33095
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
01 Oct 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jan 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Oct 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 1982 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 21 Oct 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1994 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Oct 2001 |