THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:04:08 PM
Prasad, Sharada
CPSO#:
33053
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jan 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Estonian, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil
Education: Mysore University, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sharada Prasad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:c/o Dr. Ian Park
459A Dundas Street West
Trenton ON K8V 3S4
Date Received: 02 Nov 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
QA Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Prasad has voluntarily ceased to practice medicine in all jurisdictions, effective May 31, 2016.
Dr. Prasad has voluntarily resigned from the College, effective August 31, 2016, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.