THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:34:48 AM
Ford, Michael Henry Gerrard
CPSO#:
33052
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M G 375
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6775
Fax: (416) 480-5990
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL HENRY GERRARD FORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 1985 |