THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:01:41 PM
Sheppard, Robert Reginald Benjamin
CPSO#:
33041
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6453
Fax: (807) 684-5868
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT REGINALD BENJAMIN SHEPPARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPPARD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 1982 |