THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 22:59:26 PM
Bernard, Philippe Andre
CPSO#:
33001
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
01 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Oct 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Russian
Education: Universite de Lyon I, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:15 Sep 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 1981 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Dec 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Aug 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2001 |