THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:14:09 AM
Patmanidis, Stefanos
CPSO#:
32986
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Nov 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Apr 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120 Ext. 32362
Fax: (416) 747-3350
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stefanos Patmanidis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their record may contact: The Etobicoke General Hospital Records Department: Telephone 905-494-2120, Ext. 56203
Date Received: 18 Dec 2020
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEFANOS PATMANIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATMANIDIS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2020 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2024 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: June 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)