THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:58:42 AM
Marsh, Alexander Stalker
CPSO#:
32973
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Nov 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Marsh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:c/o Dr. Akyurekli, McKenna and Rassouli
Suite 216-945 Third Avenue East
Owen Sound ON N4K 2Kb
Date Received: 02 May 2017
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy/transfer of their medical record may send their request to:
Suite 216
945 Third Avenue East
Owen Sound, ON N4K 2K8
Date Received: 20 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:05 Sep 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2017 |