THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:03:47 PM
Baum, Joseph Brian
CPSO#:
32958
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Nov 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 621
Toronto ON M9V 0A9
Phone: (416) 746-0138
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:29 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH BRIAN BAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 1981 |