THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:57:23 PM
Martin, Barry Milton
CPSO#:
32903
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Barry M. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Apr 2021 |