THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:36:07 PM
Roy, Monique Suzanne
CPSO#:
32896
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Oct 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Bordeaux, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:18 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2005 |