THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:01:33 AM
Gershony, Gary
CPSO#:
32875
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
26 Sep 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Sep 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:06 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 1981 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 26 Sep 1991 |