THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 12:42:03 PM
Egier, Brian Philip
CPSO#:
32865
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Sep 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Brian P. Egier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2013 |