THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:35:17 AM
Maimets, Talvi Christina
CPSO#:
32864
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Estonian
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Talvi C. Maimets Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 29 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:586 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 801
Toronto, ON M4P 1P2
Date Received: 18 Jan 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1982 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2021 |