THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:52:28 AM
Lee Choi, Kenneth
CPSO#:
32862
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
210-2330 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1T 0A2
Phone: 416-335-1717
Fax: 416-335-1719
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:19 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KENNETH LEE CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE CHOI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jul 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1987 |