THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:54:51 PM
Della Zazzera, Massimiliano
CPSO#:
32849
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
06 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
6-Mar-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M. Della Zazzera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 16 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 1981 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 06 Mar 2023 |