THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:20:02 PM
Jeffrey, John Frederick
CPSO#:
32793
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
603 Rankin Crescent
Kingston ON K7M 7K6
Phone: (613) 634-3428
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:02 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN FREDERICK JEFFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFFREY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1993 |