THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:06:06 PM
Stemeroff, Neil Ralph
CPSO#:
32782
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Aug 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stemeroff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2012 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 5, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Stemeroff has resigned from the College in the face of an investigation into his conduct under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.