THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:16:01 AM
Varma, Prem Kumar
CPSO#:
32759
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Jul 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: Gauhati University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Prem Varma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Requests for medical records should be directed to Dr. Varma by mail to: 1883 Bank St. Ottawa, ON, K1V 7Z9 OR fax: (613) 260-1887.
Date Received: 19 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 8, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Varma resigned from the College effective June 3, 2019. Commencing in January of 2020, the College conducted an investigation in regard to allegations of misconduct in relation to a patient in his family medicine practice. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Varma has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)