THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:23:41 AM
Menes, Catharine Elizabeth
CPSO#:
32757
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Sep 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C. E. Menes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Unit 7, 55 Frid Street, Hamilton, ON, L8P 4M3
Date Received: 24 May 2016
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHARINE ELIZABETH MENES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENES is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2020 |