THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:50:02 AM
Kain, Kevin Charles
CPSO#:
32747
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Nov 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Nov 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
MaRS Centre
Tmdt 10 351
101 College Street
Toronto ON M5G 1L7
Phone: (416) 581-7704
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:29 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:12 Apr 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN CHARLES KAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 May 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Dec 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 1991 |