THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:30:21 PM
James, Michael John
CPSO#:
32737
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jul 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
1 High Meadow Place
Unit 13
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Fax: 647 933 2904
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014
Instructions/Address:
Records Management Limited - Head Office
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 23 Jul 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jun 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 20, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective June 20, 2014, Dr. James has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.