THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:54:26 PM
Paolone, John Anthony
CPSO#:
32712
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON L2S 1X8
Phone: (905) 988-1223
Fax: (905) 988-3783
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1982 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2012 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 17 Sep 2012 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 17 Oct 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2012 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Sep 2012
Summary:
The Committee accepted as true all of the facts set out in the Agreed Statement of Facts.
Having regard to these facts, the Committee accepted Dr. Paolone’s admission and found that he committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
Therefore, having stated the finding in paragraph 1 of its written order of September 14, 2012, on the matter of penalty and costs, the Committee ordered and directed that:
2. Dr. Paolone attend before this panel to be reprimanded.
3. the Registrar suspend Dr. Paolone’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, to commence Monday, September 17, 2012.
4. the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Paolone’s certificate of registration:
(i) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete College-facilitated instruction in Ethics within 12 months of this Order; and
(ii) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete College-facilitated instruction in Record-Keeping within 12 months of this Order, and shall cooperate with a re-assessment of his medical records by representatives of the College within 6-12 months of his completion of the record-keeping course.
5. Dr. Paolone pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 14, 2012