THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:42:13 AM
Kitts, John Bryson
CPSO#:
32710
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
31 Palisade St
Nepean ON K2G 5M6
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:04 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN BRYSON KITTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KITTS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1987 |