THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:20:41 PM
O'Sullivan, Brian
CPSO#:
32703
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: National University of Ireland, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology
Room 7-323
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: 4169462983
Fax: 4169464586
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Brian O'Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:04 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN O'SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1985 |