THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:07:18 PM
McLean, Carolyn Anne
CPSO#:
32697
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
07 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jul 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Nurse, Carolyn Anne (used until: 21 Jun 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E
London, ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 12 Sep 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:09 Dec 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Sep 2018 |