THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 12:49:09 PM
Rivlin, Alex Savelij Semeon
CPSO#:
32655
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jul 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: First Leningrad Medical Institute, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:152 Foxwood Rd
Thornhill ON L4J 0G3
Tel: 647-773-1559
Date Received: 12 Aug 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1981 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2012 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 11 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2019 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Dec 2012
Summary:
On December 11, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rivlin committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise, and has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Rivlin admitted to the allegations.
On or about December 21, 2010, Dr. Rivlin pleaded guilty in the Ontario Court of Justice to one count of fraud over $5,000 and one count of possession of a prohibited weapon with ammunition. Convictions were entered on the basis of Dr. Rivlin's admissions to fraudulently billing OHIP in the amount of $168,794.21 between September of 2000 and February of 2008, while he was out of the country. He also admitted to illegally possessing a prohibited firearm and ammunition in a locked safe at his residence, which he had, at a patient's request, agreed to store in his safe after the patient inadvertently left it in his office, until the patient's return to Canada from the United States. It was seized by police during the execution of the search warrant in March of 2008.
In the criminal proceedings, Dr. Rivlin was given a ninemonth conditional sentence with three months house arrest, followed by a twoyear term of probation. He was also prohibited from billing OHIP for the duration of his conditional sentence and probation. At the time of his guilty plea and sentencing, Dr. Rivlin made restitution to OHIP.
The Discipline Committee ordered a public reprimand, a 12month suspension of Dr. Rivlin's certificate of registration and costs of $3,650.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 11, 2012
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 10, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Rivlin has voluntarily resigned from the College, effective August 10, 2019.