THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:27:39 AM
Calder, Margaret Suzanne
CPSO#:
32644
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical records may send a written request to:
1420 Burnhamthrope Rd E
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
or
Tel: 905 - 625-4016
Date Received: 16 Oct 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Margaret Suzanne Calder to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 30, 2018:
Dr. Calder has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.