THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:29:48 PM
The, Bok Lan
CPSO#:
32626
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Indonesian
Education: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1600 Steeles Ave W
Concord ON L4K 4M2
Phone: 905 _884-6119
Fax: 905-884-0528
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:12 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BOK LAN THE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1981 |