THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 0:33:02 AM
Yao, Louis Charn Hwa
CPSO#:
32621
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1920 Weston Road
Suite 230
Toronto ON M9N 1W4
Phone: (416) 241-1119
Fax: (416) 241-2623
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:08 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOUIS CHARN HWA YAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Aug 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1986 |