THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 7:47:31 AM
Truchon, Michel Leo
CPSO#:
32605
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michel Truchon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 28, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Michel Leo Truchon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 28, 2015:
Dr. Truchon has voluntarily ceased to practice medicine due to illness and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.