THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:14:58 AM
Skrypuch, Orest Wolodymyr Ilija
CPSO#:
32600
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Skrypuch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:C/O Dr. Bruen
274 Lynden Road
Unit C
Brantford, ON N3R 0B9
Date Received: 05 May 2020
Instructions/Address:Patients can write to Unit C, 274 Lynden Road, Brantford, ON, N3R 0B9
Date Received: 29 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:22 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |