THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:06:25 AM
Hastings, Donald Kevin
CPSO#:
32594
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Family Health Team
20 Emma St
Chatham ON N7L 5K5
Phone: (519) 354-2172
Fax: 8665396714
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Sydenham District Hospital |
Wallaceburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONALD KEVIN HASTINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASTINGS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 19, 2017
Expiry Date: May 9, 2017
Summary:
Effective June 14, 2019, Dr. Hastings has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)