THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:16:55 AM
Williamson, Kimberly Ann
CPSO#:
32590
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Williamson, Kimberly Ann (used until: 21 Dec 1993 )
Williamson-Hnatyshyn, Kimberly Ann (used until: 26 Jun 1984 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hospital
Emergency Department
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Phone: 905-876-7606
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANN WILLIAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1981 |