THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:48:36 AM
Walley, Virginia Margaret
CPSO#:
32588
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Laboratory Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-743-2121
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:08 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIRGINIA MARGARET WALLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLEY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 1983 |