THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:03:29 AM
Khalil, Muhammad Arshad Khan
CPSO#:
32583
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Mar 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2224 Walker Road
Suite 120
Windsor ON N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 977-7880
Fax: (519) 977-0094
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. K. Khalil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 14 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: June 12, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On June 18, 2013, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College that Dr. Khalil's privileges were restricted, effective June 12, 2013.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:29 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ARSHAD KHAN KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 16 Nov 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 1987 |