THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:51:44 PM
Panos, Anthony Lazarus
CPSO#:
32581
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiothoracic Surgery
University of Iowa Hospital & Clini
200 Hawkins Drive, SE5128 GH
Iowa City IA 52242-1062
United States
Phone: 319-356-8868
Fax: 319-356-3891
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Iowa
USA - Mississippi
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY LAZARUS PANOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANOS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1981 |