THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:35:57 PM
Griffin, Glenn Herbert
CPSO#:
32577
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Oct 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Glenn Griffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 25 2020
Corporation Name: Dr. Glenn Griffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 26 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Lakeview Family Health Team
80 Catherine St
Trenton, ON K8V 6N8
Date Received: 01 Dec 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1982 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Nov 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2020 |