THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:41:18 PM
Lata, Andrew Christopher
CPSO#:
32559
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471 Ext. 2370
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW CHRISTOPHER LATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1981 |