THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:47:58 AM
Tatham, Robert Brian
CPSO#:
32557
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: 4162892021
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Brian Tatham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 23 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:05 Sep 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT BRIAN TATHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATHAM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |