THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:10:28 AM
Rhydderch, Gareth Mervyn
CPSO#:
32553
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
5-May-2014
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gareth Rhydderch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2013
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 03 Jul 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jun 2013 |