THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:45:34 AM
Egles, Diane Elizabeth
CPSO#:
32544
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Feb 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
60 Albert Street S
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
Phone: (226) 435-3006
Fax: (226) 435-3008
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIANE ELIZABETH EGLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EGLES is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jan 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 07 May 2015 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 07 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 Jun 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 31 Oct 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 04 Jun 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2022 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Apr 2015
Summary:
On April 7, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Egles committed an act of professional misconduct in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Egles admitted to the allegation.
Dr. Egles entered into a contract with the Physician Health Program (“PHP Contract”) dated January 8, 2009, which was amended several times between February 2009 and November 2011.
In about August 2011, in breach of her PHP Contract, Dr. Egles wrote a prescription to herself in a colleague’s name and worked at a nursing home when her PHP contract prohibited her from working. The PHP reported these breaches to the College, which led to Dr. Egles entering into an Undertaking with the College on April 16, 2012 whereby she agreed that if she failed to comply with her PHP Contract “…such action may constitute a breach of this undertaking, and an act of professional misconduct.”
On April 18, 2013, the College received a letter from the PHP reporting that Dr. Egles was in breach of her PHP Contract.
On October 31, 2014, Dr. Egles entered into a health monitoring undertaking directly with the College which includes restrictions on her hours of work and patient load.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Egles’ certificate of registration for a two month period effective May 7, 2015.
- Dr. Egles appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Egles pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 7, 2015