THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:20:21 PM
Sly, Lloyd Edward
CPSO#:
32538
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. L.E. Sly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
76 Stuart St,
Kingston, Ontario
K7L 2V7
Date Received: 09 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2020 |