THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:40:43 AM
Yorston, Janet Elizabeth
CPSO#:
32523
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Oct 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Oct 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
52 George St
Box 40
Warkworth ON K0K 3K0
Phone: 613-242-5491
Fax: 705-924-2053
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. E. Yorston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:PO Box 744
Madoc, Ontario K0K 2K0
Date Received: 05 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH YORSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YORSTON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2020 |