THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:18:34 AM
Sibalis, Stephen Jeffrey
CPSO#:
32512
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
16 Nov 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
16-Nov-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Sibalis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to their medical record can contact: DocuDavit Solutions 1-888-781-9083, Fax 1-866-297-9338.
Date Received: 07 Jan 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 16 Nov 2019 |