THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:01:44 PM
Braithwaite, Nicholas Dacre Jowitt
CPSO#:
32496
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
Niagara Health
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaec
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:William Osler Health System
Health Records Department
Tel: 905-494-2120 ext. 56203
Date Received: 12 Apr 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:03 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS DACRE JOWITT BRAITHWAITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAITHWAITE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 2004 |