THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:39:42 PM
Rabheru, Kiran
CPSO#:
32494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8010
Fax: (613) 737-8115
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kiran Rabheru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRAN RABHERU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABHERU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1980 to 14 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1981 |