THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:13:50 PM
Hogg, David Hartwick
CPSO#:
32483
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 4168226182
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Hogg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Electronic medical record at the University Health Network/Princess Margaret Hospital
Date Received: 30 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:25 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID HARTWICK HOGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOGG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1981 |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1981 |